CO SB100 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the repeal of the death penalty by the general assembly in all circumstances charged on or after July 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeal The Death Penalty

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 38 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 29 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.063) (Y: 23 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.044) (Y: 23 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.052) (Y: 23 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.001) (Y: 24 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.027) (Y: 27 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-02-18 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 20-100 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 20-100 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.001) (Y: 17 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.003) (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.004) (Y: 17 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.002) (Y: 17 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (.005) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 20-100 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 20-100 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-23 Governor Signed
2020-03-13 Sent to the Governor
2020-03-13HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-03-10SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-02-26HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-25HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-18HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-02-04HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
2020-01-31SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-01-30SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2020-01-27SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb20-100
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_100_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_100_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_100_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_100_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_100_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_100_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/6fed13211aa5c718872584fc007151c0-sb20-100-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-100vote7b7965
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-100vote7aa3b1
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-100vote7b4f41
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-100vote7b0191
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-100vote79c286
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-100vote652f67
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/6fed13211aa5c718872584fc007151c0-sb20-100-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/154c60902897b4ed872585120071d027-sb20-100-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/154c60902897b4ed872585120071d027-sb20-100-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-100vote3bfdf8
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-100vote3c6c0f
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-100vote3c3908
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-100vote3c5263
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-100vote3bde5b
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-100vote69ed4f
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb20-100vote73635c

Bill Comments

feedback