CO SB096 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Habitual Offender Drug Convictions
Title
Habitual Offender Drug Convictions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-096 to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-096 to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-096 to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-096 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-096 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-096 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-096 to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-096 to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-096 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-096 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-096 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-25 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2011-03-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-03-22 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-03-22 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-03-14 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-11 | House Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-08 | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-02-22 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary | |
2011-02-18 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-02-17 | Senate Second Reading Passed | |
2011-02-14 | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-01-31 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |