CO SB088 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the criteria used by a health insurer to select health care providers to participate in the insurer's network of providers, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Participating Provider Network Selection Criteria

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-30 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 17-088 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 17-088, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment H). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment I). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment J). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 17-088, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment K). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 17-088, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-18 Governor Signed
2017-04-13 Sent to the Governor
2017-04-13HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2017-04-12SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2017-04-04HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2017-04-03HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2017-03-30HouseHouse Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2017-03-15HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment
2017-03-13SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2017-03-10SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2017-03-02SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/10/2017 - No Amendments
2017-02-28SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2017-02-13SenateSenate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Appropriations
2017-01-18SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb17-088
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_088_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_088_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_088_ren.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_088_rev.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_088_rer.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_088_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sblt2017a2017-02-13t140501z-sb17-088-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sblt2017a2017-02-13t140501z-sb17-088-4-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sblt2017a2017-02-13t140501z-sb17-088-5-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sblt2017a2017-02-13t140501z-sb17-088-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sblt2017a2017-02-13t140501z-sb17-088-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sblt2017a2017-02-13t140501z-sb17-088-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sapp2017a2017-02-28t084048z-sb17-088-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sapp2017a2017-02-28t084048z-sb17-088-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/2017%2520Senate%2520Journal.pdf#415
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hhie2017a2017-03-30t143439z-sb17-088-0-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback