CO SB086 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning updates to the laws governing business entities, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Update Business Entity Laws
Sponsors
Sen. Pete Lee [D] | Rep. Shannon Bird [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-086 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 19-086 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-086, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-086, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-086, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-086, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-086 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 19-086 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-086, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-086, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-086, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 19-086, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-09 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-19 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-18 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-17 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-16 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-10 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-03-14 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor + Appropriations |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |