CO SB083 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning prohibiting civil arrest while on courthouse grounds.
Title
Prohibit Courthouse Civil Arrest
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.007) (Y: 32 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-04 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.004) (Y: 30 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-04 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.002) (Y: 29 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-03-04 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.009) (Y: 30 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-25 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 20-083 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 20-083, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 20-083, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.007) (Y: 32 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-04 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.004) (Y: 30 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-04 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.002) (Y: 29 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-03-04 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.009) (Y: 30 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-25 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 20-083 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 20-083, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 20-083, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-23 | Governor Signed | |
2020-03-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-03-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-03-04 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-28 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-02-25 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-06 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |