CO SB082 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Wildfire Matters Review Committee
Title
Wildfire Matters Review Committee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-082 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Authorize the Wildfire Matters Review Committee as an interim study staffed by Legislative Council Staff and the Office of Legislative Legal Services (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-082 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Authorize the Wildfire Matters Review Committee as an interim study staffed by Legislative Council Staff and the Office of Legislative Legal Services (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-082 to the Committee on Legislative Council (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-082 to the Committee on Legislative Council (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer SB 13-119 to the Committee on Appropriations, as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer SB 13-119 to the Committee on Appropriations, as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Authorize the Wildfire Matters Review Committee as an interim study staffed by Legislative Council Staff and the Office of Legislative Legal Services (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-082 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Authorize the Wildfire Matters Review Committee as an interim study staffed by Legislative Council Staff and the Office of Legislative Legal Services (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-082 to the Committee on Legislative Council (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-082 to the Committee on Legislative Council (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer SB 13-119 to the Committee on Appropriations, as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L. 001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer SB 13-119 to the Committee on Appropriations, as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-05 | Senate | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-30 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed |
2013-04-26 | House | House Committee on Legislative Council Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-04-24 | House | House Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended to Legislative Council |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government + Legislative Council |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government |