CO SB079 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-24 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-24 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Safe2tell Program Revisions School Safety
Title
Safe2tell Program Revisions School Safety
Sponsors
Sen. Steve King [R] | Rep. Amy Stephens [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-079 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-079 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.002 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-01-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-079, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.002 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-01-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-079, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-079 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.002 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-01-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-079, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.002 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-01-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-079, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-24 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2012-03-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2012-03-15 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-13 | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-03-12 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed | |
2012-03-09 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-03-05 | House Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2012-02-16 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government | |
2012-02-14 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-13 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-02-02 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-01-31 | Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2012-01-19 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government |