CO SB077 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-10 - Senate Committee on Business, Labor and Technology Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-10 - Senate Committee on Business, Labor and Technology Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regulate Appraisal Management Companies
Title
Regulate Appraisal Management Companies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone indefinitely Senate Bill 10-077 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-10 | Senate Committee on Business, Labor and Technology Postpone Indefinitely | |
2010-03-02 | Senate Committee on Business, Labor and Technology Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only | |
2010-02-02 | Senate Committee on Business, Labor and Technology Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only | |
2010-01-15 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor and Technology |