CO SB076 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the procurement of consulting engineer services for department of transportation construction projects.
Title
CDOT Colorado Department Of Transportation Consulting Engineer Contracts
Sponsors
Sen. Ray Scott [R] | Sen. Janice Rich [R] | Rep. Donald Valdez [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 19-076, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 19-076, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 19-076, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 19-076, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 19-076, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 19-076, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 19-076, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 19-076, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | Governor Signed | |
2019-04-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-04-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2019-03-25 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-22 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-02-22 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |