CO SB075 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-12)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-12)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning supported decision-making agreements for adults with disabilities, and, in connection therewith, authorizing such agreements as an alternative for or supplement to a guardianship.
Title
Supported Decision-making Agreement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 57 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 21-075, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 21-075, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 21-075, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 57 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 21-075, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 21-075, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 21-075, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | Governor Signed | |
2021-04-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-04-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2021-04-13 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-12 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2021-04-07 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-30 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2021-03-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |