CO SB074 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning concurrent jurisdiction over United States military property.
Title
Jurisdiction over United States Military Property
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Gardner [R] | Rep. Matt Soper [R] | Sen. Michael Weissman [D] | Rep. Shannon Bird [D] |
Rep. Monica Duran [D] | Sen. Iman Jodeh [D] | Rep. Steven Woodrow [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-22 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 52 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 24-074 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 24-074, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 24-074 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 24-074, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Governor Signed | |
2024-03-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-03-28 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-03-22 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-21 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-08 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-03-05 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-15 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |