CO SB071 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-19 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-19 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Create Seniors Lifetime State Parks Pass
Title
Create Seniors Lifetime State Parks Pass
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-071, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - C.O.W. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-071 to Committee on Appropriations, as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - C.O.W. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 10-071 to Committee on Appropriations, as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-19 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2010-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-18 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2010-05-18 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2010-04-22 | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily | |
2010-04-15 | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over to 04/22/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily | |
2010-03-25 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-23 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-22 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-03-17 | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2010-03-04 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources | |
2010-03-03 | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-02 | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2010-03-01 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2010-02-26 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2010-02-18 | Senate Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2010-01-15 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture and Natural Resources + Appropriations |