CO SB067 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the creation of the rural development grant program, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rural Development Grant Program Creation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-067 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-067, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-067, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-30SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-29SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-27SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-26SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-25SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-23SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-02-12SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-01-29SenateSenate Committee on Finance Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations

Subjects


Colorado State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback