CO SB067 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - House Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - House Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Broadband Personal Property Tax Exemption
Title
Broadband Personal Property Tax Exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-067 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 1 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone Senate Bill 16-067 indefinitely (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-067 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-067 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 1 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone Senate Bill 16-067 indefinitely (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-067 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.003 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-067, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.008 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone Senate Bill 16-067 indefinitely (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-067 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-067 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 1 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone Senate Bill 16-067 indefinitely (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-067 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.003 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-067, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.008 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | House | House Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely |
2016-05-10 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Unamended to Finance |
2016-04-12 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor + Finance |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations |