CO SB066 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-11 - Senate Committee on Local Government Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-11 - Senate Committee on Local Government Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Metro District Conservation Trust Fund Allocations
Title
Metro District Conservation Trust Fund Allocations
Sponsors
Sen. Pat Steadman [D] | Sen. Ted Harvey [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone Senate Bill 14-066 indefinitely (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-066 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-066 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone Senate Bill 14-066 indefinitely (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-066, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-02-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001(Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-02-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-066, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-02-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001(Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-03-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-066 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-066 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone Senate Bill 14-066 indefinitely (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-066, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-02-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001(Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-02-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-066, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-02-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001(Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government Postpone Indefinitely |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government Lay Over Amended |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government |