CO SB060 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning protective orders in criminal cases.
Title
Protective Orders In Criminal Cases
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 58 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 18-060, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 18-060, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 18-060, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 18-060, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 58 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 18-060, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 18-060, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 18-060, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 18-060, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Governor Signed | |
2018-03-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-03-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2018-03-06 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-05 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-03-02 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/05/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-02-27 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-02 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |