CO SB059 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-08 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-08 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Peace Officers Obtain Liquor License
Title
Peace Officers Obtain Liquor License
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-059 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-059 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-059, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-059, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-059 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-059, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-059, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-08 | Senate | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2013-03-18 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-15 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-11 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-03-07 | House | House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-02-13 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |