CO SB056 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning programs for off-highway vehicle users, and, in connection therewith, exempting commercial use on private property from snowmobile registration, creating an out-of-state snowmobile permit to drive on publicly owned lands, and adding the search and rescue fee to snowmobile and off-highway vehicle permits.
Title
Out-of-State Snowmobile Permit & Search Rescue Fee
Sponsors
Sen. Nick Hinrichsen [D] | Sen. Perry Will [R] | Rep. Marc Snyder [D] | Rep. Ron Weinberg [R] |
Rep. Chad Clifford [D] | Rep. Meghan Lukens [D] | Rep. Tisha Mauro [D] | Rep. Julie McCluskie [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 24-056 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 24-056, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 24-056, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 24-056 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 24-056, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 24-056, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Governor Signed | |
2024-04-04 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-04-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-03-25 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-22 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-20 | House | House Committee on Transportation, Housing & Local Government Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-07 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation, Housing & Local Government |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |