CO SB055 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the expansion of market mechanisms for the further development of recycling, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Incentivize Development Recycling End Markets
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-13 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-13 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-055, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-09 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 20-055 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-055, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-055, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 20-055 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-13 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-055, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-09 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 20-055 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-055, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-055, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 20-055 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-13 | Governor Signed | |
2020-06-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-06-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-06-13 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2020-06-12 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-11 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-06-10 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-06-10 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-06-09 | House | House Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2020-06-08 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment + Appropriations |
2020-06-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |