CO SB054 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a limitation on the amount of an increase in fees assessed against assisted living residences by the department of public health and environment.
Title
Cap Fee Increases Assisted Living Residences
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 18-054 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 18-054, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 18-054, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 18-054 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 18-054, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 18-054, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Governor Signed | |
2018-02-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-02-27 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-02-21 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-20 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-16 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 02/20/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-02-13 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-02 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |