CO SB053 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Dispense Supply Of Emer Drugs For Overdose Victims

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dispense Supply Of Emer Drugs For Overdose Victims

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-053 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-053, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar The motion passed on a vote of 5-0. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-053, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar The motion passed on a vote of 5-0. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-06SenateGovernor Signed
2015-03-25SenateSent to the Governor
2015-03-19SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2015-03-09HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-03-06HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-03-03HouseHouse Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2015-01-27HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment
2015-01-27SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2015-01-26SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2015-01-21SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2015-01-08SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/AD4B893CAA6DB52B87257D90007772A6?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/AD4B893CAA6DB52B87257D90007772A6/$FILE/053_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/AD4B893CAA6DB52B87257D90007772A6/$FILE/053shhs_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/AD4B893CAA6DB52B87257D90007772A6/$FILE/053_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/AD4B893CAA6DB52B87257D90007772A6/$FILE/053_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/AD4B893CAA6DB52B87257D90007772A6/$FILE/053_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/AD4B893CAA6DB52B87257D90007772A6/$FILE/053_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/AD4B893CAA6DB52B87257D90007772A6/$FILE/053_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/EF059A03F084467A87257DD4005F914F
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2015A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/50E376FA1EF073F787257DD4005F81A3
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/50E376FA1EF073F787257DD4005F81A3
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/EF059A03F084467A87257DD4005F914F
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2015a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/F236758759CC657D87257DFD0062C603

Bill Comments

feedback