CO SB047 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-28 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-28 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Youth In Foster Care And Identity Theft Protection
Title
Youth In Foster Care And Identity Theft Protection
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 13-0. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 13-0. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-047, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-047, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended The motion passed on a vote of 7-0. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended The motion passed on a vote of 7-0. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-047, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-047, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 13-0. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-047, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-047, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended The motion passed on a vote of 7-0. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended The motion passed on a vote of 7-0. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-047, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-047, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-28 | Senate | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2013-05-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-30 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-26 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-04-23 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |