CO SB045 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-21 - Senate Second Reading Lost with Amendments - Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the repeal of the "Architectural Paint Stewardship Act".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeal Architectural Paint Stewardship Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-045, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 18-045 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-21SenateSenate Second Reading Lost with Amendments - Committee
2018-02-20SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2018-02-16SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2018-02-14SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2018-01-25SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2018-01-10SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance

Colorado State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback