CO SB044 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the scheduled repeal of reports by the department of regulatory agencies to the general assembly.
Title
Reporting Requirements By DORA To General Assembly
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-09 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer Senate Bill 17-044 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 17-044, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer Senate Bill 17-044 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 17-044, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-01 | Governor Signed | |
2017-02-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-02-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-02-10 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-09 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-06 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 02/08/2017 - No Amendments |
2017-02-02 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-27 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |