CO SB044 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-04 - House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-04 - House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Colo Collateral Conseq Conviction Act
Title
Colo Collateral Conseq Conviction Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to Postpone Indefinitely Senate Bill 11-044 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-044, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-044, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-044, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-044, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-044, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-044, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-04 | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely | |
2011-04-27 | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs | |
2011-04-26 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-25 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-19 | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Committee on Judiciary Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only | |
2011-01-19 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |