CO SB043 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - House Committee on Transportation & Energy Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - House Committee on Transportation & Energy Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning eliminating the requirement for a medical certificate for drivers of personal vehicles who provide transportation services for transportation network companies.
Title
Transportation Network Company Drivers Medical Certificate Not Required
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Lay over Senate Bill 17-043 until May 11, 2017. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 17-043 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the Consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer Senate Bill 17-043 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the Consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Postpone Indefinitely |
2017-02-06 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 01/30/2017 - No Amendments |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |