CO SB042 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the creation of the agricultural workforce development program, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the creation of the agricultural workforce development program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-09 - House - House: Third Reading Repass (Y: 50 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House: Third Reading Recede (Y: 59 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Adhere (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 49 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-042, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 18-042, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 18-042, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-042, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 18-042 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-24 Governor Signed
2018-05-16 Sent to the Governor
2018-05-16HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2018-05-16SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2018-05-09SenateHouse Considered Senate Adherence - Result was to Recede
2018-05-03SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Adhere
2018-05-03HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-05-02HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2018-05-02HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2018-04-30HouseHouse Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Appropriations
2018-04-20HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources
2018-04-17SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-04-16SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2018-04-13SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2018-04-11SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2018-02-01SenateSenate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2018-01-10SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb18-042
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_042_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_042_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_042_ren.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_042_rev.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_042_rer.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_042_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sagr2018a2018-02-01t133210z-sb18-042-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sapp2018a2018-04-11t093343z-sb18-042-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sapp2018a2018-04-11t093343z-sb18-042-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb18-042vote5589ac
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hagr2018a2018-04-30t133207z-sb18-042-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/happ2018a2018-05-02t082022z-sb18-042-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/happ2018a2018-05-02t082022z-sb18-042-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hagr2018a2018-04-30t133207z-sb18-042-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hagr2018a2018-04-30t133207z-sb18-042-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb18-042vote5a93f2
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb18-042vote13d666
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb18-042vote627b36
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb18-042vote629b7f

Bill Comments 750

feedback