CO SB040 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Complete Cemetery Expansion At Homelake Center

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Complete Cemetery Expansion At Homelake Center

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-040, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment X) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment X) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-040, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended to consent calendar The motion passed on a vote of 7-0. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended to consent calendar The motion passed on a vote of 7-0. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-040, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-040, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-24SenateGovernor Action - Signed
2013-05-21SenateSent to the Governor
2013-05-01SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2013-04-30SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2013-04-29SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2013-04-26HouseHouse Third Reading Passed
2013-04-25HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
2013-04-25HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2013-04-24HouseHouse Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations
2013-04-09SenateSenate Third Reading Passed
2013-04-09SenateIntroduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2013-04-08SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
2013-04-05SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2013-02-11SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations
2013-01-16SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7F19EBAEBCDA72CA87257AEE00571F1B?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7F19EBAEBCDA72CA87257AEE00571F1B/$FILE/040_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7F19EBAEBCDA72CA87257AEE00571F1B/$FILE/040ssta_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7F19EBAEBCDA72CA87257AEE00571F1B/$FILE/040sstaapp.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7F19EBAEBCDA72CA87257AEE00571F1B/$FILE/040_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7F19EBAEBCDA72CA87257AEE00571F1B/$FILE/040_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7F19EBAEBCDA72CA87257AEE00571F1B/$FILE/040sa_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7F19EBAEBCDA72CA87257AEE00571F1B/$FILE/040_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7F19EBAEBCDA72CA87257AEE00571F1B/$FILE/040_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7F19EBAEBCDA72CA87257AEE00571F1B/$FILE/040_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/9AE4BE61589CFB4687257B0F00773C00
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/124AF0A747CF292887257B0F00773655
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/33DAEFEE436DD8D687257B44004D622A
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/138D08BA15DAE1B187257B44004E2C1D
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/074A7B000395532487257B57006AE850
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/2E00A81D1B57FFFA87257B57006AD393
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/9AE4BE61589CFB4687257B0F00773C00
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/124AF0A747CF292887257B0F00773655
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/33DAEFEE436DD8D687257B44004D622A
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/138D08BA15DAE1B187257B44004E2C1D
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/2E00A81D1B57FFFA87257B57006AD393
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/074A7B000395532487257B57006AE850

Bill Comments 750

feedback