CO SB036 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Senate Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Senate Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the creation of an enterprise to provide infrastructure improvements that protect vulnerable road users.
Title
Vulnerable Road User Protection Enterprise
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate Finance: Postpone Senate Bill 24-036 indefinitely. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 24-036, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 24-036, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 24-036, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer Senate Bill 24-036, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Finance |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |