CO SB033 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
In-state Classification CO High School Completion
Title
In-state Classification CO High School Completion
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.004 The motion failed on a vote of 5-8. (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-033 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.004 The motion failed on a vote of 5-8. (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-033 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-033 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-033 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - L.004 The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - L.004 The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-033 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-033 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-033 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.004 The motion failed on a vote of 5-8. (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-033 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-033 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-033 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - L.004 The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - L.004 The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-033 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 13-033 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-29 | Senate | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-03-08 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-06 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-03-05 | House | House Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-01 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-02-27 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education + Appropriations |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |