CO SB029 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Finance
Hearing: Feb 25 @ 1:30 pm in Room LSB-A
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the Colorado income tax liability of an individual in active duty military service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income Tax Residency Presumption For Military

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseHouse Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Finance
2019-01-31HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs + Finance
2019-01-29SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-01-28SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-01-23SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-01-04SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs

Subjects


Colorado State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback