CO SB024 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-29 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-29 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans State Parks Admission
Title
Veterans State Parks Admission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-024 to the Committee of the Whole with favorable recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-024 to the Committee of the Whole with favorable recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-024 to the Committee of the Whole with favorable recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-024, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-024, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-024, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-024 to the Committee of the Whole with favorable recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-024 to the Committee of the Whole with favorable recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-024, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-024, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 11-024, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-29 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2011-03-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-03-25 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-03-25 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-03-18 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-17 | House Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-15 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-03-09 | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-02-02 | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs | |
2011-01-31 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-01-28 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-01-27 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-01-24 | Senate Committee on State, Veterans & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-01-12 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans & Military Affairs |