CO SB023 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning exemptions from the securities laws for cryptocurrencies, and, in connection therewith, enacting the "Colorado Digital Token Act".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cryptocurrency Exemption Colorado Digital Token Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer Senate Bill 19-023 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 19-023 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-06 Governor Signed
2019-02-27 Sent to the Governor
2019-02-26HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-02-26SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-02-19HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-02-15HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-02-13HouseHouse Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-01-31HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor
2019-01-28SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-01-25SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-01-22SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-01-04SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-023
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_023_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_023_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_023_rn2.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_023_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_023_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_023_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f32e3413eae4953d8725838a0077a679-sb19-023-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-023vote65c3b2
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/9fc1b92ed2bf64a3872583a00070d78c-sb19-023-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-023vote632c11

Bill Comments

feedback