CO SB021 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Persons With Mental Illness Criminal Justice
Title
Persons With Mental Illness Criminal Justice
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-021, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.004 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-021 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-02-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-021, as amended, to the Committee on Legislative Council (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-02-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-021, as amended, to the Committee on Legislative Council (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - For the first, the language should be: Refer Senate Bill 14-021 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - L.006 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-021, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - For the first, the language should be: Refer Senate Bill 14-021 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - L.006 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-021, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-021 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-021 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.004 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-021 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-02-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-021, as amended, to the Committee on Legislative Council (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-02-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-021, as amended, to the Committee on Legislative Council (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - For the first, the language should be: Refer Senate Bill 14-021 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - L.006 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-021, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - For the first, the language should be: Refer Senate Bill 14-021 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - L.006 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-021, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-021 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-021 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-06 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2014-04-30 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-28 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-04-28 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-25 | House | House Committee on Legislative Council Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2014-02-27 | House | House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Amended to Legislative Council |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |