CO SB021 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Term Limits Water Facility Operators Bd
Title
Term Limits Water Facility Operators Bd
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-021 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-021 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-021 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-021 to the Committee of the Whole, without amendment, and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-021 to the Committee of the Whole, without amendment, and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-021 to the Committee of the Whole, without amendment, and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-021 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-021 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-021 to the Committee of the Whole, without amendment, and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-021 to the Committee of the Whole, without amendment, and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 11-021 to the Committee of the Whole, without amendment, and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-25 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2011-03-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-03-22 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-03-22 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-03-14 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-11 | House Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-10 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-03-07 | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-02-16 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources | |
2011-02-11 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-02-10 | Senate Second Reading Passed | |
2011-02-02 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-01-27 | Senate Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-01-12 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture and Natural Resources |