CO SB020 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning mental health care professionals who are permitted to perform auricular acudetox.
Title
Registered Psychotherapists Auricular Acudetox
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 18-020 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 18-020 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer Senate Bill 18-020 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 18-020 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Governor Signed | |
2018-03-12 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-03-12 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-06 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-05 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-02 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/05/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-02-27 | House | House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-01-26 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |