CO SB020 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - House Committee on Transportation & Energy Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - House Committee on Transportation & Energy Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Motorcycle Operator Safety Training
Title
Motorcycle Operator Safety Training
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-020 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 2 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone Senate Bill 14-020 indefinitely (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-020 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-020 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone Senate Bill 14-020 indefinitely (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-020 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-020 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Postpone Indefinitely |
2014-01-28 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation |