CO SB019 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Videotape Mental Condition Evaluations
Title
Videotape Mental Condition Evaluations
Sponsors
Sen. John Cooke [R] | Rep. Lori Saine [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-10 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-019, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-019, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-019 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-019 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.011 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-019, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - This is J.002 amendment The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-019, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - This is J.002 amendment The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.011 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-019, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-019, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-019, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-019, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-019 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-019 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.011 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-019, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - This is J.002 amendment The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-019, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - This is J.002 amendment The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.011 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-019, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-019, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-10 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2016-05-10 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-05-09 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2016-05-09 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-05-05 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2016-05-03 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |