CO SB015 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 16 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the creation of the statewide health care review committee to study health care issues that affect Colorado residents throughout the state, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Create Statewide Health Care Review Committee

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 47 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-015, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-29 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 19-015, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer Senate Bill 19-015, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Joint - Legislative Council: Refer Senate Bill 19-015 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 19-015, as amended, to the Committee on Legislative Council. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-015 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-015 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 19-015 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-15HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-05-15SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-02SenateSenate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-05-02HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-05-01HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-04-30HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-30HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-04-29HouseHouse Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-04-24HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance
2019-04-24SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-23SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-04-22SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-18SenateSenate Committee on Legislative Council Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-16SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Legislative Council
2019-01-17SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-01-04SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/sb19-015
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_015_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_015_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_015_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_015_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_015_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_015_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0bf074ba056c46f8872583860003b5a4-sb19-015-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0bf074ba056c46f8872583860003b5a4-sb19-015-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f58e8c80dfb31c7887258385007770b7-sb19-015-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e0e07d4d7c6f1dc1872583de004b797d-sb19-015-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e0e07d4d7c6f1dc1872583de004b797d-sb19-015-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e0e07d4d7c6f1dc1872583de004b797d-sb19-015-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/42319f1c8c8fa948872583e0004fc8a4-sb19-015-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-015vote5a9c9d
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ea5bcfaad1b08862872583eb00747169-sb19-015-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/5fa18b6c54df42dc872583ec004de920-sb19-015-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/5fa18b6c54df42dc872583ec004de920-sb19-015-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-015vote57e0a9
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-015vote14f1f4
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/sb19-015vote151096
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ea5bcfaad1b08862872583eb00747169-sb19-015-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback