CO SB013 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-2)
Status: Passed on May 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-2)
Status: Passed on May 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning measures to address student learning loss occurring as a result of the COVID-19 pandemic.
Title
Reversing COVID-related Learning Loss
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 21-013, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 21-013, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 21-013, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 21-013, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 21-013, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 21-013, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 21-013, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 21-013, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | Governor Signed | |
2021-05-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-04-30 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2021-04-27 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-26 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-04-22 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-25 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |