CO SB013 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning expanding the grades eligible for the child nutrition school lunch protection program, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Expand Child Nutrition School Lunch Protection Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 36 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-013 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 18-013 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-013, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 18-013 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-013 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - House - House Education: Refer Senate Bill 18-013 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 18-013, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer Senate Bill 18-013 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-29 | Governor Signed | |
2018-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-05-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-05-08 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-07 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-07 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-05-07 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2018-05-02 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |