CO SB008 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-13)
Status: Passed on May 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-13)
Status: Passed on May 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning increasing support for kinship foster care homes, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Kinship Foster Care Homes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-06 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-008, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.007 (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.004 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 24-008 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 24-008, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment B). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-008, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 24-008, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment A). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 24-008, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-008, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.007 (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.004 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 24-008 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 24-008, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment B). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-008, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 24-008, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment A). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer Senate Bill 24-008, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-30 | Governor Signed | |
2024-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-05-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2024-05-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-05-02 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2024-05-01 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-18 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2024-04-10 | House | House Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Finance |
2024-03-25 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Finance |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |