CO SB001 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - House Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - House Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Unlimited Mil Retirement Benefit Tax Deduction
Title
Unlimited Mil Retirement Benefit Tax Deduction
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-001 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone Senate Bill 16-001 indefinitely (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-001 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone Senate Bill 16-001 indefinitely (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.009 The motion passed on a vote of 6-0. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-001 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 16 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.009 The motion passed on a vote of 6-0. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-001 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-01-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-001, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone Senate Bill 16-001 indefinitely (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-001 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone Senate Bill 16-001 indefinitely (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.009 The motion passed on a vote of 6-0. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-001 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 16 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.009 The motion passed on a vote of 6-0. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-001 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-01-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 16-001, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-05 | House | House Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely |
2016-05-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations |