CO SB001 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-25 - House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-25 - House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Contracting Preferences For Employing Coloradans
Title
Contracting Preferences For Employing Coloradans
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-001 to the Committee on Appropriations with a favorable recommendation (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-001 to the Committee on Appropriations with a favorable recommendation (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone indefinitely Senate Bill 12-001 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-001 to the Committee on Appropriations with a favorable recommendation (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-001 to the Committee on Appropriations with a favorable recommendation (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone indefinitely Senate Bill 12-001 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.002 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.005 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-001, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.002 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.005 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-001, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-001 to the Committee on Appropriations with a favorable recommendation (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone indefinitely Senate Bill 12-001 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-001 to the Committee on Appropriations with a favorable recommendation (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer Senate Bill 12-001 to the Committee on Appropriations with a favorable recommendation (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone indefinitely Senate Bill 12-001 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.002 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.005 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-001, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.002 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.005 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 12-001, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-25 | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely | |
2012-04-13 | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs | |
2012-04-11 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-10 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-23 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-03-19 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 03/23/2012 | |
2012-03-13 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-03-09 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2012-02-14 | Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2012-01-11 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government |