CO HM1005 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-30 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-30 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Memorialize Representative Jack McCroskey
Title
Memorialize Representative Jack McCroskey
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-04-25 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2014-04-17 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 04/25/2014 - No Amendments |
2014-04-17 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |