CO HM1003 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-22 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-22 - Signed by the Speaker of the House
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Memorialize Representative Frank Southworth
Title
Memorialize Representative Frank Southworth
Sponsors
Rep. Cole Wist [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-22 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2016-04-11 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-04-05 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 04/11/2016 - No Amendments |
2016-04-05 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |