CO HJR1022 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-04 - Senate Third Reading Passed
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-04 - Senate Third Reading Passed
Summary
Name Part Fraser River Eisenhower Memorial Reach
Title
Name Part Fraser River Eisenhower Memorial Reach
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-04 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-30 | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 05/03/2012 | |
2012-04-30 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to | |
2012-04-27 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-24 | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-04-24 | Introduced In House - Assigned to |
Colorado State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2012a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/1FEE63DA36B8CE0B872579D700530C36?Open |