CO HJR1021 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-09 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-09 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Summary
Vietnam Veterans Recognition
Title
Vietnam Veterans Recognition
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-09 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-05-06 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-05-02 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-02 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to | |
2011-05-02 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-29 | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-04-29 | Introduced In House - Assigned to |
Colorado State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7B713248C98F9A0F87257876006F2A12?Open |