CO HJR1015 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-08 - Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-08 - Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Holocaust Awareness Week
Title
Holocaust Awareness Week
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-08 | House | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |
2014-04-07 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-03 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 04/07/2014 - No Amendments |
2014-04-03 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |