CO HJR1012 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the designation of Colorado State Highway 115 between Mile Markers 7 and 10.34 through the city of Florence as the "SFC Ray Adam Archuletta Memorial Highway".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designate SFC Ray Adam Archuletta Memorial Highway

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - House: RESOLUTIONS Res (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-21HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-04-24SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-23SenateSenate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-22SenateSenate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-19SenateSenate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-16SenateSenate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/19/2019 - No Amendments
2019-04-15SenateSenate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-15SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to
2019-04-12HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-10HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over to 04/12/2019 - No Amendments
2019-04-09HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-05HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to

Colorado State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback